math

posted by .

multiply using mental math 25*400=

  • math -

    What answer did you get?

Respond to this Question

First Name
School Subject
Your Answer

Similar Questions

  1. 5th Grade math

    What is a partial-products algorithm. For example 87*65=?
  2. 5th Grade Math

    I need help in using the distributive property to rewrite this expression: (7 x 600) + (7 x 400) and then multiply.
  3. 3rd grade math

    How can you use mental math to multiply 800 x 5?
  4. math

    Multiply using Lattice Multiplication 23 x 45 379 x 24 379 x 450 Multiply by using the Russian Peasant Method 27 x 79 38 x 126
  5. math mental math help

    i need to use mental math and the distributive property to simplify: can you pls check if this correct?
  6. math help

    i need to use mental math and the distributive property to simplify: can you pls check if this correct?
  7. math probability

    How many three digits codes (single digits 0-9) are possible part A is codes must exceed value of 400 i think answer is 400 multiply 10 multiply 400 or 400x400x400 as three digits
  8. Math

    What is the best way to use mental math to multiply (5x18)x20?
  9. Algebra

    Explain how to use mental math to simplify the expression. a.) 8 * 3 * 2 b.) 8 * 2 + 3 c.) 5 + 8 + 3 d.) 10 * 3 -4 I have to explain the process. Example: Using the associative property of multiplication I can group 8*(3*2) so I get …
  10. History

    Reference Maps and Thematic Maps vary across the globe. Which of the following is the correct answer?

More Similar Questions