Algebra; Please help.

posted by .

Describe how you can use mental math to find the product.
15*25

  • Algebra; Please help. -

    25 = 100/4

    so 1500/4, if you can do that in your head

Respond to this Question

First Name
School Subject
Your Answer

Similar Questions

  1. marketing

    I need a better understanding please. Do you know a commercial I could use Think of a product that you have seen advertised on television, a magazine, or on the radio. Describe the product and identify two external influences that …
  2. Algebra Please Help

    Am not that great in math. Describe the different methods that can be used to find the product: (2x-5)(3x-1). I know there is the foil method. Describe the different methods that can be used to find the product: (5x+1)^2
  3. Algebra Please Help

    Can you please give a example so that I can understand it better. 1)How can you tell whether a polynomial is written in factor form. 2)Construct a trinomial whose greatest common factor is 2x^2. 3)Describe the different methods that …
  4. algebra mental math distributive property

    find each product mentally using the distributive property i know for 4 (10.2) i do this = 4 (10 + 2) = 4 (10) + 4 (2) = 40. + .8 = 40.8 but I am not sure how to show work on on following 2 problems: 11.6 (9) and 3.4 (5)
  5. math

    whats the product of -8x^2y and-2xy^3? use law of exponents to find the product. show your work. please helppp
  6. math

    find the product using mental math and the distributive property for 7(15) showing the work as shown
  7. math mental math help

    i need to use mental math and the distributive property to simplify: can you pls check if this correct?
  8. math VERY URGENT AND IMPORTANT

    Estimate the product of 1 9/10 and 15. Describe your method. Also,estimate the product of 3 7/8 and 25. Describe your method. Please answer and explain.
  9. math

    find the product of 27*60.then explain how you would use mental math to find the product of 27*600.
  10. math

    Find the product of 27×60. Then explain how you would use mental math to find the product of 27×600

More Similar Questions