Sunday
March 26, 2017

Posts by Bosnian

Total # Posts: 2,404

Algebra
5 ( a - 7 ) + 7 = 2 ( a - 5 ) 5 * a - 5 * 7 + 7 = 2 * a - 2 * 5 5 a - 35 + 7 = 2 a - 10 5 a - 28 = 2 a - 10 Subtract 2 a to both sides 5 a - 28 - 2 a = 2 a - 10 - 2 a 3 a - 28 = - 10 Add 28 to both sides 3 a - 28 + 28 = - 10 + 28 3 a = 18 Divide both sides by 3 3 a / 3 = 18 / ...
August 3, 2015

MATH
If the sum of the n term = 225 your question does not make sense. It can not be solved. But if the sum of the n term = 255 then : In geometric sequence : The nth term is : an = a1 * r ^ ( n - 1 ) Where a1 is the first term of the sequence. r is the common ratio. n is the ...
August 1, 2015

Math
A) 7 2 / 9 = 7 + 2 / 9 = 7 * 9 / 9 + 2 / 9 = 63 / 9 + 2 / 9 = 65 / 9 ( 6 / 5 ) * ( 65 / 9 ) = 6 * 65 / ( 5 * 9 ) = 2 * 3 * 5 * 13 / ( 5 * 3 * 3 ) = 2 * 13 / 3 = 26 / 3 B) 6 2 / 7 = 6 + 2 / 7 = 6 * 7 / 7 + 2 / 7 = 42 / 7 + 2 / 7 = 44 / 7 2 * 44 / 7 = 88 / 7
August 1, 2015

mathematics
Volume of a sphere : V = ( 4 \ 3 ) * pi * r ^ 3 Radius increased by 5% New radius : rN = r + ( 5 / 100 ) * r = r + 0.05 * r = 1.05 * r rN = 1.05 * r New volume of a sphere : VN = { 4 \ 3 ) * pi * rN ^ 3 = { 4 \ 3 ) * pi * ( 1.05 r ) ^ 3 = { 4 \ 3 ) * pi * ( 1.05 ) ^ 3 * r ^ 3...
July 31, 2015

Math
taxexs = 4,550 / 35,000 = 0.13 = 13 % 35,000 + 4,000 = 39,000 39,000 * 0.13 = 5,070 5,070 - 4,550 = 520 \$ OR 4,550 / 35,000 = x / ( 35,000 + 4000 ) 4,550 / 35,000 = x / 39,000 4,550 * 39,000 = x * 35,000 x = 4,550 * 39,000 / 35,000 x = 177,450,000 / 35,000 x = 5,070 \$ 5,070 - ...
July 24, 2015

algebra
( - a - 6 b + 4 ) 3 a b = ( - a ) * 3 a b - 6 b * 3 a b + 4 * 3 a b = - 3 a ^ 2 * b - 18 a * b ^ 2 + 12 ab
July 24, 2015

Math
In google type : Multiplying and dividing decimals, multiply two or more decimals. When you see list of results click on : w w w . m o n t e r e y i n s t i t u t e . o r g
July 16, 2015

math
b = numer of boys g = number of girls There are 5 more girls than boys. g = b + 5 b + g = 49 b + b + 5 = 49 2 b + 5 = 49 Suptract 5 to both sides 2 b + 5 - 5 = 49 - 5 2 b = 44 Divide both sides by 2 2 b / 2 = 44 / 2 b = 22
July 16, 2015

math
b = numer of boys g = number of girls There are 15 more girls than boys. g = b + 15 b + g = 323 b + b + 15 = 323 2 b + 15 = 323 Subtract 15 to both sides 2 b + 15 - 15 = 323 - 15 2 b = 308 Divide both sides by 2 2 b / 2 = 308 / 2 b = 154
July 16, 2015

Algebra
Both answers is correct but you can simplify answer 1. sqrt ( 280 x ^ 6 ) / sqrt ( 7 x ) = sqrt ( 280 x ^ 6 / 7 x ) = sqrt [ ( 280 / 7 ) * x ^ 6 / x ] = sqrt ( 40 * x ^ 5 ) = sqrt ( 40 ) * sqrt ( x ^ 5 ) = sqrt ( 4 * 10 ) * sqrt ( x ^ 5 ) = sqrt ( 4 ) * sqrt ( 10 ) * sqrt ( x...
July 9, 2015

math
She is used: 350 ft - 110 ft = 240 ft of fence Perimeter of a square : P = 4 a 4 a = 240 ft Divide both sides by 4 a = 60 ft
July 9, 2015

maths
sqrt ( 2 ) isnt root of a cubic polynomial 6 x ^ 3 + 2 x ^ 2 - 10 x - 4 sqrt ( 2 )
July 5, 2015

math
In google type: integral calculator with steps When you see list of results click on: Integral Calculator with Steps - eMathHelp When page be open in rectangle: Enter a function type: x^3/(x^2+1)^(1/2) Remark: You must type function exactly in this form with brackets at (1/2) ...
July 5, 2015

math arithmetic sequence and series
If the initial term of an arithmetic progression is a1 and the common difference of successive members is d, then the nth term of the sequence (an is given by: an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) * d This sum : S = n * [ 2 a1 + ( n - 1 ) * d ] / 2 In this case : a1 = 30 d = 3 n = 15 S = n...
June 30, 2015

Maths
59 * 59 - 41 * 41 = 3481 - 1681 = 1800 = 2 * 900 = 2 * 2 * 450 = 2 * 2 * 2 * 225 = 2 * 2 * 2 * 3 * 75 = 2 * 2 * 2 * 3 * 3 * 25 = 2 * 2 * 2 * 3 * 3 * 5 * 5 = 2 ^ 3 * 3 ^ 2 * 5 ^ 2
June 30, 2015

algebra
In google type : mathportal roots calculator When you see list of result click on : Online Polynomial Roots Calculator with explanation When page be open in rectangle type : x^4 + 2 x^3 - 13 x^2 + 4 x - 30 and cick option : Find Roots You will see solution step by step
June 23, 2015

How can you predict the number of x-intercepts without drawing the graph. Discriminant = b ^ 2 - 4 a c If the discriminant is positive, then there are two distinct roots ( x - intercepts ). If the discriminant is zero, then there is exactly one real root x - intercept ). If ...
June 6, 2015

- a x ^ 2 - b x - c = - ( a x ^ 2 + b x + c ) Quadratic function can be concave up or concave down. If a x ^ 2 + b x + c concave up or concave down graph of - a x ^ 2 - b x - c will be concave down or concave up. The graph is rotated 180 ° around the x - axis, but x-...
June 6, 2015

Calculus
Copy your question in google. When you see list of results click on : e n . a l l e x p e r t s . c o m You will see answer.
June 6, 2015

Math
( m ^ 2 - m + 3 ) + ( m - 1 ) = m ^ 2 - m + 3 + m - 1 = m ^ 2 - m + m + 3 - 1 = m ^ 2 + 2 ( m ^ 2 - m + 3 ) - ( m - 1 ) = m ^ 2 - m + 3 - m - ( - 1 ) = m ^ 2 - m - m + 3 + 1 = m ^ 2 - 2 m + 4
June 2, 2015

mat/116
x = score of second test average = ( 74 + x ) / 2 78 = ( 74 + x ) / 2 Multiply both sides by 2 156 = 74 + x Subtract 74 to both sides 156 - 74 = 74 + x - 74 82 = x x = 82 average = ( 74 + x ) / 2 = ( 74 + 82 ) / 2 = 156 / 2 = 78
May 25, 2015

math
May 19, 2015

math
8 * 10 ^ 3 * 7 * 10 ^ 5 = 8 * 7 * 10 ^ 3 * 10 ^ 5 = 56 * 10 ^ 8 = 5.6 * 10 * 10 ^ 8 = 5.6 * 10 ^ 9 ________________________________ Remark: a ^ n * a ^ m = a ^ ( m + n ) 10 ^ 3 * 10 ^ 5 = 10 ^ ( 3 + 5 ) = 10 ^ 8 10 = 10 ^ 1 10 * 10 ^ 8 = 10 ^ 1 * 10 ^ 8 = 10 ^ ( 1 + 8 ) = 10...
May 19, 2015

prealgebra
5 / 45 = 5 / ( 5 * 9 ) = 1 / 9
May 14, 2015

Math
an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) * d an = 4.6 + ( n - 1 ) * 3.2
May 13, 2015

Math
In arithmetic sequence : an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) * d d is the common difference n is the number of the term to find a6 = a1 + ( 6 - 1 ) * d = 20.6 a1 + 5 d = 20.6 a9 = a1 + ( 9 - 1 ) * d = 30.2 a1 + 8 d = 30.2 Now you must solve system of two equations with two unknown : a1 + 5 d...
May 13, 2015

Math
- 16 t ^ 2 + 200 = 0 Subtract 200 to toth sides - 16 t ^ 2 + 200 - 200 = 0 - 200 - 16 t ^ 2 = - 200 Divide both sides by - 16 - 16 t ^ 2 / - 16 = - 200 / - 16 t ^ 2 = - 200 / -16 t ^ 2 = 200 / 16 t ^ 2 = 4 * 50 / ( 4 * 4 ) t ^ 2 = 50 / 4 t ^ 2 = 2 * 25 / ( 2 * 2 ) t ^ 2 = 25...
May 13, 2015

Math
4 sin ( theta ) + 1 = 2 sin ( theta ) Subtract 2 sin ( theta to both sides ) 4 sin ( theta ) + 1 - 2 sin ( theta ) = 2 sin ( theta ) - 2 sin ( theta ) 2 sin ( theta ) + 1 = 0 Subtract 1 to both sides 2 sin ( theta ) + 1 - 1 = 0 - 1 2 sin ( theta ) = - 1 Divide both sides by 2 ...
May 13, 2015

Maths
a = the length of the larger square b = the length of the smaller square a ^ 2 + b ^ 2 = 65 Possible combinations : a = 1 , b = 8 , a ^ 2 + b ^ 1 = 1 ^ 2 + 8 ^ 2 = 1 + 64 = 65 But the length of the smaller square is greater of the length of the larger square. You must reject ...
May 5, 2015

math
m = number of male lions f = number of female lions m / f = 21 / 20 Multiply both sides by 20 20 m / f = 21 * 20 / 20 20 m / f = 21 Multiply both sides by f 20 m * f / f = 21 * f 20 m = 21 f Divide both sides by 20 20 m / 20 = 21 f / 20 m = 21 f / 20 m + f = 123 ...
May 5, 2015

math
L = 2 W + 3 A = L * W = ( 2 W + 3 ) * W = 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W A = 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W 54 = 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W Subtract 54 to both sides 54 - 54 = 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W - 54 0 = 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W - 54 2 W ^ 2 + 3 W - 54 = 0 The solutions are : W = - 6 and W = 9 / 2 Width can't be negative so : W = 9 / ...
May 5, 2015

math
2 x ^ 2 ( 5 x ^ 2 - 1 x - 4 ) = ( 2 x ^ 2 * 5 x ^ 2 ) - ( 2 x ^ 2 * 1 x ) - ( 2 x ^ 2 * 4 ) = 10 x ^ 4 - 2 x ^ 3 - 8 x ^ 2
May 2, 2015

(Algebra) need help plz
Straight-line equations is the "slope-intercept" form: y = m * x + b x = - 1 , y = - 2 y = m * x + b - 2 = m * ( - 1 ) + b - 2 = - m + b Add 2 to both sides - 2 + 2 = - m + b + 2 0 = - m + b + 2 Add m to both sides 0 + m = - m + b + 2 + m m = b + 2 x = 0 , y = 1 y = ...
May 1, 2015

math
Watch x and y values : x = - 2 , y = - 4 , y = 2 x x = 0 , y = 0 , y = 2 x x = 2 , y = 4 , y = 2 x x = 4 , y = 8 , y = 2 x y = 2 x
April 27, 2015

math
p = \$100 + \$0.2 * kilometers Answer C.
April 27, 2015

Math
10 = 2 * 5 20 = 2 * 10 40 = 2 * 20 I geometric sequence : an = a1 * r ^ ( n - 1 ) where a1 is the first term of the sequence. r is the common ratio. n is the number of the term to find In this case : a1 = 5 r = 2 an = a1 * r ^ ( n - 1 ) an = 5 * 2 ^ ( n - 1 )
April 20, 2015

Calculus
In google type : Shortest Ladder over a Fence When you see list of results click on: Shortest Ladder over a Fence - Mathematics Archives You will see solution.
April 20, 2015

math
Prime factors decomposition: 4312440 = 2 * 2 * 2 * 3 * 3 * 3 * 3 * 5 * 11 * 11 * 11 Divisors are 2 , 3 , 5 , 11 4 divisors.
April 20, 2015

Algebra 1
2 x - y = z Add y to both sides 2 x - y + y = z + y 2 x = z + y Subtract z to both sides 2 x - z = z + y - z 2 x - z = y y = 2 x - z
April 20, 2015

Math
3,000 cm Becouse 1 m = 100 cm 3,000 cm = 3,000 / 100 = 30 m
April 20, 2015

math
Completely fill the 7 gallon bucket. Pour the water from 7 gallon bucket into 12 gallon bucket. Again completely fill the 7 gallon bucket. Pour the water from 7 gallon bucket into 6 gallon bucket. Now in 7 gallon bucket you have 7 - 6 = 1 gallon. Pour that 1 gallon into 12 ...
April 16, 2015

Math
1.) a1 = 16.5 a2 = 16.5 + 0.25 = 16.75 a3 = 16.75 + 0.25 = 17 a4 = 17 +0.25 = 17.25 a5 = 17.25 +0.25 = 17.5 2.) an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) * d an = - 1 + ( n - 1 ) * 5 OR an = 5 ( n - 1 ) - 1
April 16, 2015

Math
In an Arithmetic Sequence the difference between one term and the next is a constant. 19 - 14 = 5 24 - 19 = 5 29 - 24 = 5 So difference = 5 29 + 5 = 34 34 + 5 = 39 39 + 5 = 44 Answer A
April 16, 2015

pre-calc
When you want to solve system with three unknowns you must write three equations, not two.
April 16, 2015

math
3. Answer c Becouse : For x = - 4 y = 2 x – 3 = 2 * ( - 4 ) - 3 = - 8 - 3 = - 11 4. Answer d If your expression mean y = - x + 8 6. m = ( y2 - y1 ) / ( x2 - x1 ) In this case : x1 = 6 , x2 = 4 , y1 = 2 , y2 = - 2 m = ( y2 - y1 ) / ( x2 - x1 ) = ( - 2 - 2 ) / ( 4 - 6...
April 16, 2015

math
( 10 , - 52 ) Becouse : For x = 10 y = - 5 x - 4 = - 5 * 10 - 4 = - 50 - 4 = - 54
April 16, 2015

Geometry
The interior angles of a triangle always add up to 180° x + x + 10° + 2 x - 6° = 180° 4 x + 4° = 180° Subtract 4° to both sides 4 x + 4° - 4° = 180° - 4° 4 x = 176° Divide both sides by 4 4 x / 4 = 176° / 4 x = 44° Angles...
April 8, 2015

algebra
In google type : Systems Matrix Calculator When you see list of result click on : Online calculator. Linear equations solver: Matrix solution. When page be open type your coefficients 1 , 3 , 2 , 3 2 , - 1 , - 3 , - 8 5 , 2 , 1 , 9 and click opštion : Solve the system. ...
April 7, 2015

ALGEBRA /116
-5 x / 7 - 2 > - 1 Multiply both sides by - 1 _______________________________________ Remark : When you multiply or divide each side of the inequality by a negative number, you have to reverse the inequality symbol. ______________________________________ 5 x / 7 + 2 < 1 ...
April 7, 2015

algebra/116
Put x and y values into equation : y = 6 x - 6 1. x = 0 , y = - 6 y = 6 x - 6 y = 6 * 0 - 6 = 0 - 6 = - 6 Correct x = 12 , y = 3 y = 6 x - 6 y = 6 * 12 - 6 = 72 - 6 = - 66 Not correct One correct set and one uncorrect set. So ansver 1 is not correct. 2. x = 0 , y = - 6 y = 6 x...
April 7, 2015

math
( 3 / 4 ) * ( 7 / 8 ) = ( 3 * 7 ) / ( 4 * 8 ) = 21 / 32
April 4, 2015

calculus
W = Width L = Length Draw rectangle W x L Divde rectangle into thirds with two lines parallel with width. Outside fance perimeter = 2 W + 2 L Inside fance length = 2 W Total cost : ( 2 W + 2 L ) * 10 \$ + 2 W * 20 \$ = 400 \$ ( 2 W + 2 L ) * 10 + 2 W * 20 = 400 20 W + 20 L + 40 W...
April 3, 2015

math
39 = 3 * 13
April 2, 2015

math
a = First number b = Second number The sum of digit = 9 a + b = 9 Subtract b to both sides a + b - b = 9 - b a = 9 - b The different of digit = 5 b - a = 5 b - ( 9 - b ) = 5 b - 9 + b = 5 2 b - 9 = 5 Add 9 to both sides 2 b - 9 + 9 = 5 + 9 2 b = 14 Divide both sides by 2 2 b...
April 2, 2015

math help
x + y = 2 Subtract x to both sides x + y - x = 2 - x y = 2 - x 3 x ^ 2 + 4 x y + y ^ 2 = 6 3 x ^ 2 + 4 x ( 2 - x ) + ( 2 - x ) ^ 2 = 6 ________________________________ Remark : ( a - b ) ^ 2 = a ^ 2 - 2 a b + b ^ 2 So : ( 2 - x ) ^ 2 = 2 ^ 2 - 2 * 2 *x + x ^ 2 ...
March 31, 2015

Algebra 1
This is not systems of equations.
March 30, 2015

Math
330 ° = 360 ° - 30 ° Circular functions: sin ( 360 ° - theta ) = - sin theta sin 330 ° = sin ( 360 ° - 30 ° ) = - sin 30 ° = - 1 / 2 cos ( 360 ° - theta ) = cos theta cos 330 ° = cos ( 360 ° - 30 ° ) = cos 30 ° = sqroot 2 / 2...
March 28, 2015

General Question.
In Psychology : Dark orange - Distrust Pink - Caring Blue - Loyalty
March 27, 2015

math
For example : First : Rectangle 18 x 2 Perimeter = 2 * 18 + 2 * 2 = 36 + 4 = 40 Area = 18 * 2 = 36 Second : Rectangle 7 x 6 Perimeter = 2 * 7 + 2 * 6 = 14 + 12 = 26 Area = 7 * 6 = 42
March 23, 2015

1 1 / 2 = 1 + 1 / 2 = 2 / 2 + 1 / 2 = 3 / 2 If She uses 1 1/2 cups of sugar for every 2 pies she use ( 1 1 / 2 ) / 2 = ( 3 / 2 ) / 2 = 3 / 4 cup for one pie. 5 1 / 4 = 5 + 1 / 4 = 20 / 4 + 1 / 4 = 21 / 4 5 1 / 4 / ( 3 / 4 ) = 21 / 4 / ( 3 / 4 ) = 21 / 3 = 7 pies
March 23, 2015

Math
Note that, in this sequence, each term is twice the previous term. 6 / 4 = 2 * 3 / 4 12 / 4 = 2 * 6 / 4 = 3 24 / 4 = 2 * 12 / 4 = 2 * 3 = 6 48 / 4 = 2 * 24 / 4 = 2 * 6 = 12 96 / 4 = 2 * 48 / 4 = 2 * 12 = 24 192 / 4 = 2 * 96 / 4 = 2 * 24 = 48 384 / 4 = 2 * 192 / 4 = 2 * 48 = 96...
March 23, 2015

Trigonometry
943 ° = 720 ° + 223 ° = 2 * 360 ° + 223 ° Coterminal angle = 223 °
March 19, 2015

- 10 x + y = 4 x = - 2 - 10 * ( - 2 ) + y = 4 20 + y = 4 y = 4 - 20 = - 16 x = - 1 - 10 * ( - 1 ) + y = 4 10 + y = 4 y = 4 - 10 = - 6 x = 0 - 10 * 0 + y = 4 0 + y = 4 y = 4 x = 1 - 10 * 1 + y = 4 - 10 + y = 4 y = 4 + 10 = 14 x = 2 - 10 * 2 + y = 4 - 20 + y = 4 y = 4 + 20 = 24
March 19, 2015

Math
an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) d a10 = 3 + ( 10 - 1 ) * 6 a10 = 3 + 9 * 6 = 3 + 54 = 57
March 14, 2015

Math
In arithmetic sequence : an = a1 + ( n - 1 ) d Where: a1 is the first term of the sequence d is the common difference n is the number of the term a1 = 3 a4 = 3 + ( 3 - 1 ) d = 3 + 2 d a13 = 3 + ( 13 - 1 ) d = 3 + 12 d 1st, 4th, and 13th term forming a geometric sequence, so : ...
March 14, 2015

Math
2 / 3 = 2 / 3 * 1 = ( 2 / 3 ) * ( 3 / 3 ) = 6 / 9 2 / 9 + 2 / 3 = 2 / 9 + 6 / 9 = 8 / 9
March 11, 2015

MATH
March 11, 2015

Algebra 2
3 square root( 2 x + 1 ) = 3 square both sides 3 ^ 2 * square root( 2 x + 1 ) ^ 2 = 3 ^ 2 9 * ( 2 x + 1 ) ^ 2 = 9 Divide both sides by 9 2 x + 1 = 1 Subtract 1 to both sides 2 x + 1 - 1 = 1 - 1 2 x = 0 Divide both sides by 2 x = 0
March 11, 2015

Algebra 2
square root ( 5 - 2 x ) + 5 = 12 Subtract both 5 to both sides square root ( 5 - 2 x ) + 5 - 5 = 12 - 5 square root ( 5 - 2 x ) = 7 Square both sides 5 - 2 x = 49 Subtract 5 to both sides 5 - 2 x - 5 = 49 - 5 - 2 x = 44 Divide both sides by - 2 x = 44 / - 2 x = - 22
March 11, 2015

Algebra 2
square root ( 2 x - 5 ) = 7 Square both sides 2 x - 5 = 49 Add 5 to both sides 2 x - 5 + 5 = 49 + 5 2 x = 54 Divide both sides by 2 x = 54 / 2 x = 27
March 11, 2015

MATHS
In google type : Cryptarithmetic Puzzle Solver When you see list of results click on : bach.istc.kobe-u.ac.jp/llp/crypt When page be open in rectangle type: lass+lad=love and click on: Solve Problem have 250 solutions.
March 6, 2015

2 3/4 = 2 * 4 / 4 + 3 / 4 = 8 / 4 + 3 / 4 = 11 / 4 1 1/2 = 2 * 1 / 2 + 1 / 2 = 2 / 2 + 1 / 2 = 3 / 2 A = L * W = 11 / 4 * 3 / 2 = 33 / 8 = 32 / 8 + 1 / 8 = 4 1/8
March 5, 2015

1 1/4 = 1 + 1 / 4 = 4 / 4 + 1 / 4 = 5 / 4 5 / 4 * 1 / 5 = 5 / 4 * 5 = 1 / 4
March 5, 2015

Math
1.) 3 x - 5 y = 2 Add 5y to both sides 3 x - 5 y + 5 y = 2 + 5 y 3 x = 2 + 5 y Subtract 2 to both sides 3 x - 2 = 2 + 5 y - 2 3 x - 2 = 5 y 5 y = 3 x - 2 2 x + 5 y = 13 2 x + 3 x - 2 = 13 5 x - 2 = 13 Add 2 to both sides 5 x - 2 + 2 = 13 + 2 5 x = 15 Divide both sides by 5 5 x...
March 3, 2015

Math
Substitution method: x – 2 y = 0 Add 2 y to both sides x – 2 y + 2 y = 0 + 2 y x = 2 y 3 x – y ^ 2 = 0 3 * 2 y - y ^ 2 = 0 6 y - y ^ 2 = 0 - y ^ 2 + 6 y = 0 Multiply both sides by - 1 y ^ 2 - 6 y = 0 y * y - 6 y = 0 y * ( y - 6 ) = 0 Obviously solution y = 0 and...
March 2, 2015

Maths
What mean x 7 y = 5 ? x - 7 y = 5 x + 7 y = 5 x ^ 7 y = 5
March 2, 2015

math
3.9 / 11.7 = 16.5 / x Multiply both sides by x 3.9 * x / 11.7 = 16.5 * x / x 3.9 x / 11.7 = 16.5 Multiply both sides by 11.7 3.9 x * 11.7 / 11.7 = 16.5 * 11.7 3.9 x = 193.05 Divide both sides by 3.9 3.9 x / 3.9 = 193.05 / 3.9 x = 49.5 ft OR 11.7 = 3.9 * 3 So : 3. 9 / 11.7 = 3....
March 1, 2015

February 27, 2015

calculus
If your expression mean: lim sin ^ 3 ( 3 x ) / ( x sin ( x ^ 2) ) , as x -> 0 then : f ( x ) = sin ^ 3 ( 3 x ) g ( x ) = x sin ( x ^ 2) lim [ f ( x ) / g ( x ) ] as x->0 = lim f ( x ) , as x -> 0 / lim g ( x ) , as x -> 0 = lim sin ^ 3 ( 3 x ) , as x -> 0 / lim ...
February 27, 2015

alg 2
h = 25 t - 5 t ^ 2 Replace t with 3 h = 25 * 3 - 5 * 3 ^ 2 h = 75 - 5 * 9 h = 75 - 45 = 30 m
February 24, 2015

Math homework
20 / 8 = 4 * 5 / ( 4 * 2 ) = 5 / 2 = 2.5 min / page 2.5 * 20 = 50 min OR 8 / 20 = 20 / x Multiply both sides by x 8 * x / 20 = 20 * x / x 8 x / 20 = 20 Multiply both sides by 20 8 x * 20 / 20 = 20 * 20 8 x = 400 Divide both sides by 8 8 x / 8 = 400 / 8 x = 50 min
February 24, 2015

maths
6 / 9 = 8 / x Multiply both sides by x 6 * x / 9 = x * 8 / x 6 x / 9 = 8 Multiply both sides by 9 6 x * 9 / 9 = 8 * 9 6 x = 72 Divide both sides by 6 6 x / 6 = 72 / 6 x = 12 6 : 9 = 8 : 12
February 24, 2015

math
6 + x = 12 Subtract 6 to both sides 6 + x - 6 = 12 - 6 x = 6
February 20, 2015

ALGEBRA
x1 = - 1 x2 = 0 x3 = 1 x4 = 2 x2 - x1 = 0 - ( - 1 ) = 0 + 1 = 1 x3 - x2 = 1 - 0 = 1 x4 - x3 = 2 - 1 = 1 y1 = - 2 y2 = 1 y3 = 4 y4 = 7 y2 - y1 = 1 - ( - 2 ) = 1 + 2 = 3 y3 - y2 = 4 - 1 = 3 y4 - y3 = 7 - 4 = 3 Since both x and y increase by a constant difference ( x increases by...
February 16, 2015

math
m = 5 n = 8 m - n = 5 - 8 = - 3 m - n divided by 4 = - 3 / 4
February 16, 2015

math
( m - n ) / 4 = ( 5 - 8 ) / 4 = - 3 / 4
February 16, 2015

Pre-Calculus
2000 = 1990 + 10 M ( t ) = 29.9 ( t + 10 ) ^ 2 + 3892 M ( t ) = 29.9 ( t ^ 2 + 2 t * 10 + 10 ^ 2 ) + 3892 M ( t ) = 29.9 ( t ^ 2 + 20 t + 100 ) + 3892 M ( t ) = 29.9 t ^ 2 + 29.9 * 20 t + 29.9 * 100 + 3892 M ( t ) = 29.9 t ^ 2 + 598 t + 2990 + 3892 M ( t ) = 29.9 t ^ 2 + 598 t...
February 16, 2015

Algebra
1. C The degree of a monomial is the sum of the exponents of all its variables. 3 + 2 = 5 2. B ( 7 t ^ 2 + 9 ) + ( 6 t ^ 2 + 8 ) = 7 t ^ 2 + 9 + 6 t ^ 2 + 8 = 13 t ^ 2 + 17 3. A 4 D 5. D ( 5 x ^ 3 + 2 ) ( 5 x ^ 3 - 2 ) = 5 x ^ 3 * 5 x ^ 3 + 5 x ^ 3 * 2 - 2 * 5 x ^ 3 - 2 * 2 = ...
February 12, 2015

math
( 2000 - 40 ) / 200 = 160 / 200 = 40 * 4 / ( 40 * 5 ) = 4 / 5 = 0.8 = 0.8 * 100 % = 80 %
February 11, 2015

science
1 mile = 1.609344 km When you convert 26.22 miles in kilometers you get: 26.22 * 1.609344 = 42.19699968 km approx. 42.197 km But he marathon is a long-distance running event with an OFFICIAL DISTANCE of 42.195 kilometres. You can type: Marathon in google
February 9, 2015

math,algebra
A = W * L = 8 * 16 = 128 ft ^ 2
February 9, 2015

math,algebra
P = Perimeter L = Length W = Width P = 2 W + 2 L = 2 ( W + L ) L = 2 W P = 2 ( W + L ) = 2 ( W + 2 W ) = 2 * 3 W = 6 W 48 = 6 W Divide both sides by 6 48 / 6 = 6 W / 6 8 = W W = 8 ft L = 2 W = 2 * 8 = 16 ft P = 2 ( W + L ) = 2 ( 8 + 16 ) = 2 * 24 = 48 ft
February 9, 2015

Math Question
B.) Correction. sin ^ 2 x + cos ^ 2 x = 1 and 1 - sin ^ 2 x = cos ^ 2 x But Answer B.)
February 9, 2015

Math Question
B.) Becouse : sin ^ 2 x + cos ^ 2 x = 1 and sin ^ 2 x - 1 = cos ^ 2 x Other 3 expression are identity.
February 9, 2015

Percentages ques 2
A = B - 20 % B = B - 0.2 B = 0.8 B A = 0.8 B Divide both sides by 0.8 A / 0. 8 = 0.8 B / 0.8 1.25 A = B B = 1.25 A B = 2 C Divide both sides by 2 B / 2 = C C = B / 2 C = 1.25 A / 2 C = 0.625 A = 0.625 A * 100 /100 = 62.5 % A
February 9, 2015

Percentages
60 % = 60 / 100 = 0.6 80 % = 80 / 100 = 0.8 x = Number of games in season A team has played so far x - 15 games and won 60 % of the games . So : 0.6 * ( x - 15 ) + 15 = 0.8 x 0.6 x - 0.6 * 15 + 15 = 0.8 x 0.6 x - 9 + 15 = 0.8 x 0.6 x + 6 = 0.8 x Subtract 0.6 x to both sides 0....
February 9, 2015

math
You want to find two numbers whose product is 10 and whose sum is 18. So solution 1 and solution 2 are same solution. The numbers are: 9 - sqroot ( 71 ) and 9 + sqroot ( 71 )
February 9, 2015

math
a = first number b = second number Conditions : a * b = 10 a + b = 18 a + b = 18 Subtract a to both sides a + b - a = 18 - a b = 18 - a a * b = 10 a * ( 18 - a ) = 10 18 a - a ^ 2 = 10 - a ^ 2 + 18 a = 10 Multiply both sides by - 1 a ^ 2 - 18 a = - 10 [ Add ( 18 /2 ) ^ 2 = 9...
February 9, 2015

math/algebra
Copy your question in google. When you see list of results click on : w w w . a l g e b r a . c o m / c g i - b i n / j u m p - t o - q u e s t i o n . m p l You will see solution.
February 6, 2015

Maths
5 x + y = 35 Subtact 5 x to both sides 5 x + y - 5 x = 35 - 5 x y = 35 - 5 x 3 x - 2 y = 14 3 x - 2 ( 35 - 5 x ) = 14 3 x - 2 * 35 - 2 * ( - 5 x ) = 14 3 x - 70 + 10 x = 14 13 x - 70 = 14 Add 70 to bopth sides 13 x - 70 + 70 = 14 + 70 13 x = 84 Divide both sides by 13 13 x / ...
February 4, 2015

Post a New Question