Tuesday
March 28, 2017

# Posts by Bosnian

Total # Posts: 2,405

math 115
Reiny Volume isn't (100)(290)(29) km^3 a river is 100 kilometers long 290 meters wide and 29 meters deep 1 km = 1000 m 1 m = 1 / 1000 m 290 m = 290 / 1000 = 0.29 km 29 m = 29 / 1000 = 0.029 km Volume = ( 100 * 0.29 * 0.029 ) km ^ 3 = 0.841 km ^ 3 = 8.41 * 10 ^ - 1 km ^ 3
October 3, 2016

math 115
1 m = 10 dm 1 km = 1,000 m = 10,000 dm 100 km * 290 m * 29 m = 100 * 10,000 dm * 290 * 10 dm * 29 * 10 dm = ( 1,000,000 * 2,900 * 290 ) dm ^ 3 = ( 10 ^ 6 * 2.9 * 10 ^ 3 * 2.9 * 10 ^ 2 ) dm ^ 3 = ( 10 ^ 6 * 10 ^ 3 * 10 ^ 2 ) * ( 2.9 * 2.9 ) dm ^ 3 = ( 10 ^ 11 * 2.9 ^ 2 ) dm ^ 3...
October 3, 2016

Math (Trig Review)
tan ( arctan x ) = x cot x = 1 / tan x tan ( arccot x ) = tan [ arc (1 / tan x ) ] = 1 / tan ( arctan x ) = 1 / x tan ( arccot 2 ) = tan [ arc (1 / tan 2 ) ] = 1 / tan ( arctan 2 ) = 1 / 2
September 30, 2016

math
4 ( x + 3 ) = 5 x - 2 4 * x + 4 * 3 = 5 x - 2 4 x + 12 = 5 x - 2 Subtract 4 x to both sides 4 x + 12 - 4 x = 5 x - 4 x - 2 12 = x - 2 Add 2 to both sides 12 + 2 = x - 2 + 2 14 = x x = 14
September 29, 2016

Math
S = Sheila´s money R = Rita´s money Sheila and Rita had \$300 mean: S + R = 300 S + R = 300 Subtract S to both sides S + R - S = 300 - S R = 300 - S After Shiela gave \$56 to Rita, Shiela had: S - 56 dollars Rita had: R + 56 = 300 - S + 56 = 356 - S Rita had 5 times ...
September 29, 2016

carson high school
5 r - 3 s = 19 Multiply both sides by - 2 5 r * ( - 2 ) - 3 s * ( - 2 ) = 19 * ( - 2 ) - 10 r + 6 s = - 38
September 29, 2016

carson high school
5 r - 3 s = 19 Multiply both sides by - 2 - 5 r * ( - 2 ) - 3 s * ( - 2 ) = 19 * ( - 2 ) - 10 r + 6 s = - 38 Now your system become: - 10 r + 6 s = - 38 + 2 r - 6 s = - 2 __________________ - 10 r + 2 r + 6 s - 6 s = - 38 + ( - 2 ) - 8 r = - 38 - 2 - 8 r = - 40 Divide both ...
September 29, 2016

Algabra
D = Dick's age T = Tom's age H = Harry's age M = Mother's age D < T D > H D = T - 2 Add 2 to both sides D + 2 = T - 2 + 2 D + 2 = T T = D + 2 M = 3 D also: M = 2 T + 13 = 2 ( D + 2 ) + 13 = 2 * D + 2 * 2 + 13 = 2 D + 4 + 13 = 2 D + 17 M = M 3 D = 2 D + 17...
September 26, 2016

Algebra
6 = 6 * 3 / 3 = 18 / 3 6 = x + 2 / 3 18 / 3 = x + 2 / 3 Subtract 2 / 3 to both sides 18 / 3 - 2 / 3 = x + 2 / 3 - 2 / 3 16 / 3 = x x = 16 / 3
September 21, 2016

Math
1 / 2 = 1 * 4 / ( 2 * 4 ) = 4 / 8 1 / 2 + 3 / 8 = 4 / 8 + 3 / 8 = 7 / 8
September 21, 2016

Matrices
In google type: 2x2 System of Equations - Solver that Shows Steps When you see list of results clik on: 2x2 System of Equations - Solver that Shows Steps - Math Lessons When page be open type your coefficients: 3 , - 9 , 30 and 2 , 5 , -2 Click on: Solve by using Cramer's ...
September 21, 2016

Maths - Ratio
A = Angelique's ages S = Serena’s ages V = Venus’ ages A / S = 5 / 3 S / V = 6 / 5 Angelique is 25 years older than Venus mean: A = V + 25 Replace this value in equation: A / S = 5 / 3 ( V + 25 ) / S = 5 / 3 Multiply both sides by S V + 25 = 5 S / 3 Multiply both...
September 21, 2016

Pre algebra
Replace s = 4 and t = 8 in your equation. 2 s t ^ 2 - s ^ 2 = 2 * 4 * 8 ^ 2 - 4 ^ 2 = 2 * 4 * 64 - 16 = 8 * 64 - 16 = 512 - 16 = 496
September 14, 2016

Math HELP!
3 / 4 = 0.75 - 5 / 6 = - 0.833 0.75 > - 0.833 3 / 4 > - 5 / 6 - 1 3/4 = - 1.75 3 / 4 = 0.75 - 1.75 < 0.75 - 1 3/4 < 3 / 4 2 3/4 = 2.75 2 4/6 = 2 2/3 = 2.666 2.75 > 2.666 2 3/4 > 2 4/6
September 13, 2016

maths
A = P ( 1 + r / n ) ^ ( n * t ) A = total amount P = principal or amount of money deposited, r = annual interest rate n = number of times compounded per year t = time in years In this case : P = 224000 R = 2 % = 2 / 100 = 0.02 n = 1 t = 16 A = P ( 1 + r / n ) ^ ( n * t ) A = P...
September 13, 2016

geometry
Area of a regular hexagon = [ 3 sqroot ( 3 ) / 2 ] * a ^ 2 Where, a is the side of the hexagon. A = [ 3 sqroot ( 3 ) / 2 ] * a ^ 2 A = [ 3 sqroot ( 3 ) / 2 ] * 4 ^ 2 A = [ 3 sqroot ( 3 ) / 2 ] * 16 A = [ 3 sqroot ( 3 ) / 2 ] * 2 * 8 A = 3 sqroot ( 3 ) * 8 A = 24 sqroot ( 3 ) ...
September 13, 2016

math
If your expression mean: ( 3.96 x 10 ^ 2 ) / ( 1.5 x 10 ^ 6 ) then: 3.96 x 10 ^ 2 / 1.5 x 10 ^ 6 = ( 3.96 / 1.5 ) * ( 10 ^ 2 / 10 ^ 6 ) = 2.64 x 10 ^ ( 2 - 6 ) = 2.64 x 10 ^ -4
August 31, 2016

math
15 2/6 = 15 + 2 / 6 = 15 * 6 / 6 + 2 / 6 = 90 / 6 + 2 / 6 = 92 / 6 Multiply both sides by 4 4 * 92 / ( 4 * 6 ) = 368 / 24 15 2/6 = 368 / 24 9 1/4 = 9 + 1 / 4 = 9 * 4 / 4 + 1 / 4 = 36 / 4 + 1 / 4 = 37 / 4 Multiply both sides by 6 6 * 37 / ( 6 * 4 ) = 222 / 24 9 1/4 = 222 / 24 ...
August 31, 2016

Maths
A = b * h / 2 = [ ( 11 / 2 ) * ( 7 / 3 ) ] / 2 = ( 77 / 6 ) / 2 = 77 / 12
August 31, 2016

Math
17 - 2 * 3 - 8 = 3 17 - 6 - 8 = 11 - 8 = 3 33 / 3 - 2 * 5 = 1 11 - 10 = 1
August 31, 2016

math
( 1 + x + x ^ 2 ) ^ 3 = [ ( 1 + x ) + x ^ 2 ] ^ 3 Now use formulas: ( a + b ) ^ 2 = a ^ 2 + 2 a b + b ^ 2 and ( a + b ) ^ 3 = a ^ 3 + 3 a ^ 2 * b + 3 a * b ^ 2 + b ^ 3 [ ( 1 + x ) + x ^ 2 ] ^ 3 = ( 1 + x ) ^ 3 + 3 ( 1 + x ) ^ 2 * x ^ 2 + 3 ( 1 + x ) * ( x ^ 2 ) ^ 2 + ( x ^ 2...
August 31, 2016

Urgent Math
OR cot ( 2x ) - csc ( 2x ) = cos ( 2x ) / sin ( 2x ) - 1 / sin ( 2x ) = [ cos ( 2x ) - 1 ) ] / sin ( 2x ) Since the: cos ( 2x ) = cos ^ 2 x - sin ^ 2 x sin ( 2 x ) = 2 sin x cos x you can write: cot ( 2x ) - csc ( 2x ) = ( cos ^ 2 x - sin ^ 2 x - 1 ) / 2 sin x cos x = [ ( - 1...
August 28, 2016

Math
210,004,050
August 28, 2016

algebra
l = length w = width P = perimeter l = 2 w P = 2 ( l + w ) = 126 2 ( 2 w + w ) = 126 2 * 3 w = 126 6 w = 126 w = 126 / 6 = 21 ft l = 2 w = 2 * 21 = 42 ft
August 28, 2016

Math
A = b * h / 2 14 = 4 * h / 2 14 = 2 h h = 14 / 2 = 7
August 28, 2016

Math
g = the greater part s = the smaller part 2 g = 3 s Divide both sides by 2 g = ( 3 / 2 ) s g + s = 75 ( 3 / 2 ) s + s = 75 ( 3 / 2 ) s + ( 2 / 2 ) s = 75 ( 5 / 2 ) s = 75 Multiply both sides by 2 5 s = 75 * 2 5 s = 150 Divide both sides by 5 s = 150 / 5 s = 30 g = ( 3 / 2 ) s ...
August 27, 2016

CGTC
9 % = 9 / 100 = 0.09 7 % = 7 / 100 =0.07 x = the amount of money \$100 less then three times the amount = 3 x - 100 x * 0.09 + ( 3 x - 100 ) * 0.07 = 83 0.09 x + 3 x * 0.07 - 100 * 0.07 = 83 0.09 x + 0.21 x - 7 = 83 0.3 x - 7 = 83 0.3 x = 83 + 7 0.3 x = 90 x = 90 / 0.3 x = 300 ...
August 27, 2016

Math
"Prime Factorization" is finding which prime numbers multiply together to make the original number. In this case: 6 = 2 * 3 = 2 ^ 1 * 3 ^ 1 9 = 3 ^ 2 15 = 3 * 5 = 3 ^ 1 * 5 ^ 1 The highest power of the three prime numbers 2, 3, and 5 is: 2 ^ 1 = 2 3 ^ 2 = 9 5 ^ 1 = 5...
August 27, 2016

Math
1 * 300,000 / 10 = 300,000 / 10 = 30,000
August 25, 2016

Math
V = A * h 7,168 = 521 h Divide both sides by 512 7,168 / 512 = h 14 = h h = 14 cm
August 24, 2016

Math
|- 8| = 8 - 6 < |- 8| -6 < 8 Answer B
August 24, 2016

pre calculus honors
x + y + z = 15 7 x + y + z = 75 3 x + y - z = 29 Multiply first equation by − 7 ( x + y + z = 15 ) * ( - 7 ) -7 x - 7 y - 7 z = - 105 add this to the second equation -7 x - 7 y - 7 z = - 105 + 7 x + y + z = 75 ____________________ The result is: - 6 y - 6 z = - 30 Divide...
August 24, 2016

Math
( x + 1 ) * 500500 = 500500 ( x + 1 )
August 20, 2016

Math
If you in google type: Sum of numbers 1 to 100 By the way: 1 + 2 + 3 + 4 + . . . . + n = ( 1 + n )*( n / 2 ) 1 + 2 + 3 +…100 n = 100 1 + 2 + 3 +…100 =( 1 + 100 ) * ( 100 / 2 ) = 101 * 50 = 5050 ( x + 1 ) + 2 ( x + 1) + …+ 1000 ( x + 1 ) = ( x + 1 ) ( 1 + 2 +......
August 20, 2016

Math
This is calculus problem. In an open box you have square base with area a ^ 2 and 4 rectangle with area a * h where a is length of base and h is height of box Area of an open box: A = a ^ 2 + 4 a * h A = a ^ 2 + 4 a * h = 24 Subtract a ^ 2 to both sides a ^ 2 + 4 a * h - a ^ 2...
August 19, 2016

Math
22 - 10 = 12 34 - 22 = 12 46 - 34 = 12 58 - 46 = 13 70 - 58 = 12 Missing number = 70
August 16, 2016

math
25 = 5 * 5 35 = 5 * 7 1.25 = 5 / 4 25 / 35 = 1.25 / x become: 5 * 5 / ( 5 * 7 ) = 5 / 4x 5 / 7 = 5 / 4x Divide both sides by 5 1 / 7 = 1 / 4x Multiply both sides by x x / 7 = 1 / 4 Multiply both sides by 7 x = 7 / 4 = 1.75
August 16, 2016

Maths
16 baqgs * 1.5 kg = 24 kg \$672 / 24 kg = \$28 / kg 18 bags * 2 kg = 36 kg 36 kg * \$28 / kg = \$ 1,008 OR 16 * 1.5 / ( 18 * 2 ) = 672 / x 24 / 36 = 672 / x 2 * 12 / ( 3 * 12 ) = 672 / x 2 / 3 = 672 / x 2 * x = 3 * 672 2 x = 2,016 x = 2,016 / 2 x = \$ 1,008
August 15, 2016

math
625 = 25 * 25 ã625 = 25 sqroot ( ã625 ) = sqroot ( 25 ) = 5
August 15, 2016

Algebra
-5 > -8 Draw a number line: 0, - 1, - 2, - 3, - 4 , - 5, - 6 , - 7, - 8, - 9...
August 12, 2016

math
In your case x and y coordinates are: x1 = 0, x2 = 2, x3 = 4, x4 = 6 y1 = - 3, y2 = - 2, y3 = -1, y4 = 0 slope = change in y / change in x This mean, divide the change in height by the change in horizontal distance. slope = ( y2 - y1 ) / ( x2 - x1 ) = [ - 2 - ( - 3 ) ] / ( 2...
August 12, 2016

maths
Sum of a certain number of terms of an arithmetic sequence: Sn = n ( a1 + an ) / 2 In this case: S9 = 9 ( a1 + a9 ) / 2 = 279 S20 = 20 ( a1 + a20 ) / 2 = 1280 9 ( a1 + a9 ) / 2 = 279 Multiply both sides by 2 9 ( a1 + a9 ) = 279 * 2 9 a1 + 9 a9 = 558 On the other side: an = a1...
August 11, 2016

math
Replace 2 instead p in your equation. ( 34 + 18 p ) - ( 5 + p ) = ( 34 + 18 * 2 ) - ( 5 + 2 ) = 34 + 36 - 7 = 70 - 7 = 63
August 11, 2016

math
A perfect square is a number that can be expressed as the product of two equal integers. 169 = 13 * 13 A perfect cube is a number that can be expressed as the product of three equal integers. 169 = 5.5287748 * 5.5287748 * 5.5287748 5.5287748 isn't whole number so 169 is a ...
August 11, 2016

math
100.1 % = 100.1 / 100 ( 100.1 / 100 ) * ( 10 / 10 ) = 1001 / 1000 100.1 % = 1001 / 1000
August 11, 2016

Algebra
60 * 4 / 5 = 240 / 5 = 48 48 students are members of Math Club. Among the members, 3 / 5 are girls: 48 * 3 / 5 = 144 / 5 = 28.8 girls 48 - 28.8 = 19.2 boys Your question does not make sense.
August 11, 2016

math
S = Present Sam's age B = Present brother's age Sam is one-third as old as his brother mean: S = B / 3 After six year Sam will be S + 6 years od. Brother will be B + 6 years old. In six years Sam will be one-half as old mean: ( S + 6 ) / ( B + 6 ) = 1 / 2 Now you must ...
August 11, 2016

Maths
a + b = 14 a * b = 40 a + b = 14 Subtract a to both sides a + b - a = 14 - a b = 14 - a a * b = 40 a * ( 14 - a ) = 40 14 a - a ^ 2 = 40 - a ^ 2 + 14 a = 40 Subtract 40 to both sides - a ^ 2 + 14 a - 40 = 40 - 40 - a ^ 2 + 14 a - 40 = 0 Multiply both sides by - 1 a ^ 2 - 14 a...
August 7, 2016

math
a1 + a2 + a3 + a4 + a5 = 44 The sum of a certain number of terms of a geometric sequence: Sn = a1 * ( 1 - r ^ n ) / ( 1 - r ) In this case you have 5 terms: a1 + a2 + a3 + a4 + a5 = 44 S5 = a1 * ( 1 - r ^ 5 ) / ( 1 - r ) = 44 a1 * ( 1 - r ^ 5 ) / ( 1 - r ) = 44 The sum of the ...
August 7, 2016

Precalculus
sin u = 4 / 5 cos u = sqroot ( 1 - sin ^ 2 u ) cos u = sqroot [ 1 - ( 4 / 5 ) ^ 2 ] cos u = sqroot ( 1 - 16 / 25 ) cos u = sqroot ( 25 / 25 - 16 / 25 ) cos u = sqroot ( 9 / 25 ) cos u = ± 3 / 5 In Quadrant II cos is negative so: cos u = - 3 / 5 sin v = - 12 /13 cos v = ...
August 3, 2016

Math
L = 2 W P = 2 L + 2 W = 2 ( L + W ) P = 54 2 ( L + W ) = 54 Divide both sides by 2 L * W = 54 / 2 L + W = 27 Replace L = 2 W in this equation. 2 W + W = 27 3 W = 27 Divide both sides by 3 W = 27 / 3 W = 9 m L = 2 W = 2 * 9 = 18 m Proof: P = 2 ( L + W ) = 2 ( 18 + 9 ) = 2 * 27...
August 3, 2016

pre cal
sin u = 1 / 3 cos u = sqroot [ 1 - sin u ) ^ 2 ] sqroot [ 1 - ( 1 / 3 ) ^ 2 ] = sqroot ( 1 - 1 / 9 ) = sqroot ( 9 / 9 - 1 / 9 ) = sqroot ( 8 / 9 ) = sqroot ( 4 * 2 / 9 ) = sqroot ( 4 / 9 ) * sqroot ( 2 ) = + OR - ( 2 / 3 ) * sqroot ( 2 ) cos u = + OR - 2 sqrt ( 2 ) / 3 sin v...
August 3, 2016

pre algebra
L = larger numbr S = smaller number The difference between two numbers is 44 mean: L - S = 44 Five times the smaller is equal to 8 more than the larger mean: 5 S = L + 8 Now youust solve sytem of two equation with two unknow. L - S = 44 5 S = L + 8 L - S = 44 Add S to both ...
July 30, 2016

Math
4*15-11+8-2=20 ______________________ 4*1(5-1)-1(+8/-2)= 4 * 1 * 4 - 1 * ( - 4 ) = 16 + 4 = 20
July 30, 2016

Maths
1st term: n = 1 Sn = 3 n - 2 S1 = 3 * 1 - 2 = 3 - 2 = 1 3rd term: n = 3 Sn = 3 n - 2 S3 = 3 * 3 - 2 = 9 - 2 = 7 5th term: n = 5 Sn = 3 n - 2 S5 = 3 * 5 - 2 = 15 - 2 = 13
July 30, 2016

pre cal
A cubic function is a function of the form: f ( x ) = a ^ 3 + b x ^ 2 + c x + d You must find 4 coefficients: a , b , c , and d You now zero pionts: x = - 5 , y = 0 x = 2 , y = 0 and x = 4 , y = 0 You also know : f ( - 10 ) = - 4 Now put this values in equation: f ( x ) = a x...
July 27, 2016

Math
12 * 20 = 240
July 23, 2016

Math
n = 2 didit number a = tens b = ones So: n = 10 a + b The number exceeds the sum of digits by18 mean: n = a + b + 18 Now equalize exspressions for n. n = n 10 a + b = a + b + 18 Subtract b to both sides 10 a + b - b = a + b + 18 - b 10 a = a + 18 Subtract a to both sides 10 a...
July 23, 2016

math
3 / 7 = 15 / x Multiply both sides by x 3 x / 7 = 15 Multiply both sides by 7 3 x = 15 * 7 3 x = 105 Divide both sides by 3 x = 105 / 3 x = 35 3 / 7 = 15 / 35
July 22, 2016

math
1 h 45 min = 60 min + 45 min = 105 min 24 / 105 = 64 / x Muultiply both sides bx x 24 x / 105 = 64 Multiply both sides by 105 24 x = 64 * 105 24 x = 6720 Divide both sides by 24 x = 6720 / 24 = 280 min x = 240 min + 40 min = 4 * 60 min + 40 min = 4 h 40 min OR 64 / 24 = 8 * 8...
July 22, 2016

Math
a) 13 , 17 , 25 , 27 , 28 , x , 32 , 36 , 37 , 40 , y , 47 The median is the middle number. But there is no "middle" number, because there are an even number of numbers. In this case, the median is the mean (the usual average) of the middle two values: The median...
July 22, 2016

math
x = present age In five years time thabo will be three times as old as he was nine years ago, mean: 5 + x = 3 ( x - 9 ) 5 + x = 3 x - 27 Subtract x to both sides 5 + x - x = 3 x - 27 - x 5 = 2 x - 27 Add 27 to both sides 5 + 27 = 2 x - 27 + 27 32 = 2 x Divide both sides by 2 ...
July 22, 2016

Math
x ^ - 1/4 = 4 ^ -1/2 mean: 1 / fourth root of x = 1 / square root of 4 1 / fourth root of x = 1 / 2 Taking reciprocial of both sides: fourth root of x = 2 Rise both sides to the power of four x = 2 ^ 4 x = 16 q^ 1/2 = x mean : square root of q = x Rise both sides to the power ...
July 19, 2016

Math
c and d are positive consecutive odd integers mean : c = d + 2 becouse : if d are odd integers, next integer are d + 2 So: c + d = 240 d + d + 2 = 240 2 d + 2 = 240 Subtract 2 to both sides 2 d + 2 - 2 = 240 - 2 2 d = 238 Divide both sides by2 d = 238 / 2 = 119 c = d + 2 c = ...
July 19, 2016

Math
| a - 2 | = 9 a - 2 = + OR - 9 1 solution: a - 2 = 9 Add 2 to both sides a - 2 + 2 = 9 + 2 a = 11 2 solution: a - 2 = - 9 Add 2 to both sides a - 2 + 2 = - 9 + 2 a = - 7 | w - 1 | = 6 w - 1 = + OR - 6 1 solution: w - 1 = 6 Add 1 to both sides w - 1 = 6 + 1 w = 7 2 solution: w...
July 19, 2016

Math
first number: a second number: a + 1 third number: a + 2 fourth number: a + 3 fifth number: a + 4 a + a + 1 + a + 2 + a + 3 + a + 4 = 80 5 a + 10 = 80 Subtract 10 to both sides 5 a + 10 - 10 = 80 - 10 5 a = 70 Divide both sides by 5 a = 70 / 5 = 14 The numbers : 14, 15, 16, 17...
July 19, 2016

math
g = the greater angle s = the smaller angle = g / 2 The sum of the angles in a triangle is 180 ° 60 ° + g + s = 180 ° 60 ° + g / 2 + g = 180 ° 60 ° + g / 2 + 2 g / 2 = 180 ° 60 ° + 3 g / 2 = 180 ° Subtract 60 ° to both sides 3 g / 2 = ...
July 19, 2016

math
cos ^ 2 A = 1 - sin ^ 2 A cos ^ 6 A + sin ^ 6 A = ( 1 - sin ^ 2 A ) ^ 3 + ( sin ^ 2 A ) ^ 3 = _________________________________Remark : ( a - b ) ^ 3 = a ^ 3 - 3 a ^ 2 b + 3 a b ^ 2 - b ^ 3 In case ( 1 - sin ^ 2 A ) ^ 3 a = 1, b = sin ^ 2 A so : ...
July 18, 2016

math
S = number of students g = number of girls b = number of boys b = g + 17 S = g + b S = g + g + 17 S = 2 g + 17 g = 4 / 9 S so : S = 2 * ( 4 / 9 ) S + 17 S = ( 8 / 9 ) S + 17 Subtract ( 8 / 9 ) S to both sides S - ( 8 / 9 ) S = ( 8 / 9 ) S + 17 - ( 8 / 9 ) S ( 9 / 9 ) S - ( 8...
July 7, 2016

Pre-Cal
Use Trigonometric Identities : sin ( x / 2 ) = + OR - sqroot [ ( 1 - cos x ) / 2 ] cos ( x / 2 ) = + OR - sqroot [ ( 1 + cos x ) / 2 ] 0° < x < 90° meen x lies in Quadrant I In Quadrant I sin x and cos x are positive so : sin ( x / 2 ) = sqroot [ ( 1 - cos x ) / ...
July 7, 2016

math
30 = 8 * sqroot ( h - 40 ) Divide both sides by 8 30 / 8 = sqroot ( h - 40 ) 2 * 15 / ( 2 * 4 ) = sqroot ( h - 40 ) 15 / 4 = sqroot ( h - 40 ) Raise both sides to the power of two : ( 15 / 4 ) ^ 2 = h - 40 225 / 16 = h - 40 Add 40 to both sides 225 / 16 + 40 = h - 40 + 40 225...
July 6, 2016

math
3 x / 4 - 16 = 44 Add 16 to both sides 3 x / 4 - 16 + 16 = 44 + 16 3 x / 4 = 60 Multiply both sides by 4 3 x = 240 Divide both sides by 3 x = 240 / 3 x = 80 Proof : 3 * 80 / 4 - 16 = 240 / 4 - 16 = 60 - 16 = 44
July 2, 2016

Mathematics
P ( x ) = x ^ 3 + 2 x ^ 2 - 11 x - 12 This is a polynomial of degree 3. To find zeros for polynomials of degree 3 or higher we use Rational root test. The Rational Root Theorem tells you that if the polynomial has a rational zero then it must be a fraction p / q, where p is a ...
July 2, 2016

math
W / L = 60 / 80 = 20 * 3 / 20 * 4 = 3 / 4
July 2, 2016

Math
A = Ama's ages K = Karla's ages D = Daniel's ages Ama is 3 years older than Karla this mean : A = K + 3 Daniel is 2 years older than Ama this mean : D = A + 2 The sum of their ages is 32 this mean : A + K + D = 32 Now you have 3 equatios : A = K + 3 D = A + 2 A + K...
June 25, 2016

Math
x = 10% = 10 / 100 = 0.1 10% acid solution of 40 mL = 0.1 * 40 mL = 4 mL of acid Volume of new acid solution = 40 mL + x where x = volume of added wather 4 mL represent 4 % 4 % = 4 / 100 = 0.04 Now 4 mL of acid / new volume = 4 % =0.04 4 mL / ( 40 mL + x ) = 0.04 In ...
June 24, 2016

Math
4 3 / 5 = 4 + 3 / 5 = 4 * 5 / 5 + 3 / 5 = 20 / 5 + 3 / 5 = 23 / 5 ( 2 / 3 ) / 4 3 / 5 = ( 2 / 3 ) / ( 23 / 5 ) = 2 * 5 / ( 3 * 23 ) = 10 / 69 pounds
June 12, 2016

math
3 ( x - 2 ) ^ 2 - 12 = 0 Divide both sides by 3 3 ( x - 2 ) ^ 2 / 3 - 12 / 3 = 0 / 3 ( x - 2 ) ^ 2 - 4 = 0 Add 4 to both sides ( x - 2 ) ^ 2 - 4 + 4 = 0 + 4 ( x - 2 ) ^ 2 = 4 Take square root of both sides x - 2 = + OR - sqroot ( 4 ) x - 2 = + OR - 2 1 solution : x - 2 = - 2 ...
June 12, 2016

algebra
Yes. ( x + c ) ^ 2 = x ^ 2 + 2 * x * c + c ^ 2 In this case : 2 x c = 14 x Divide both sides bny 2 x 2 x c / 2 x = 14 x / 2 x c = 7 So : ( x + c ) ^ 2 = x ^ 2 + 2 * x * c + c ^ 2 ( x + 7 ) ^ 2 = x ^ 2 + 2 x * 7 + 7 ^ 2 = x ^ 2 + 14 x + 49
June 1, 2016

algebra 1
x ^ 8 * 2 y ^ 10 * 5 x ^ 5 = 2 * 5 * x ^ 8 * x ^ 5 * y ^ 10 = 10 x ^ ( 8 + 5 ) * y ^ 10 = 10 x ^ 13 y ^ 10
June 1, 2016

Algebra
f ( x ) = - x ^ 2 + 5 x + 4 f ( 3 ) = - 3 ^ 2 + 5 * 3 + 4 = - 9 + 15 + 4 = 10 f ( 5 ) = - 5 ^ 2 + 5 * 5 + 4 = - 25 + 25 + 4 = 4 The average rate of change : [ f ( 5 ) - f ( 3 ) ] / ( 5 - 3 ) = ( 10 - 4 ) / ( 5 - 3 ) = 6 / 2 = 3 Answer A
May 24, 2016

Maths (Need Help)
If y^2-1/4y=0 mean : y ^ 2 - ( 1 / 4 ) y = 0 then : Write y ^ 2 like : 4 y ^ 2 / 4 Now : 4 y ^ 2 / 4 - ( 1 / 4 ) y = 0 ( 1 / 4 ) 4 y - ( 1 / 4 ) y = 0 ( 1 / 4 ) ( 4 y ^ 2 - y ) = 0 ( 1 / 4 ) y ( 4 y - 1 ) = 0 Now you must solwe two equations : ( 1 / 4 ) y = 0 and 4 y - 1 = 0...
May 24, 2016

math
Go on : calc101.c o m When page be open click option : derivative then in rectangle Take the derivative of type : sin[cos[x^2]] and click option : DO IT You will see solution step by step.
May 24, 2016

Math
d = Diameter P = Perimeter P = d * pi = 14 * pi 4 P = 4 * 14 * pi = 56 pi = 56 * 3.14159 = 175.92904 in approx. 176 in
May 24, 2016

Math
Now Rony is 16 years old Sister is 16 / 4 = 4 years old After x years Rony will be 16 + x yeras old Sister will be 4 + x years old Now you must solve equation : ( 16 + x ) / ( 4 + x ) = 2 Multiply both sides by 4 + x 16 + x = 2 ( 4 + x ) 16 + x = 8 + 2 x Subtract 8 to both ...
May 24, 2016

Algebra
c = children a = adults 2200 people enter the zoo mean : c + a = 2200 \$4,550.00 is collected mean : 1.5 c + 4 a = 4550 Now you must solve system: c + a = 2200 1.5 c + 4 a = 4550 c + a = 2200 Subtract c to both sides c + a - c = 2200 - c a = 2200 - c 1.5 c + 4 a = 4550 1.5 c + ...
May 24, 2016

Algebra
x = 70% alcohol solution y = 30% alcohol solution 120 L of a 45% solution have : 120 * 0.45 = 54 L alcohol Now you must solve system : 0.7 x + 0.3 y = 54 x + y = 120 The solutions are : x = 45 L , y = 75 L Proof : 0.7 * 45 + 0.3 * 75 = 31.5 + 22.5 = 54 L x + y = 45 + 75 = 120 L
May 20, 2016

1 ft = 12 in 60 / 12 = 5 ft
May 18, 2016

Algebra
Correct answer. ( a + b ) ^ 2 = a ^ 2 + 2 a b + b ^ 2 In this case : a = 1 2 a b = 9 2 * 1 * b = 9 2 b = 9 Divide both sides by 2 b = 9 / 2 c = b ^ 2 = ( 9 / 2 ) ^ 2 = 81 / 4 ( x + 9 / 2 ) ^ 2 = x ^ 2 + 9 x + ( 81 / 4 )
May 13, 2016

Maths
y = the width L = the length A = the area of original rectangle A = y * L = 140 y * L = 140 Divide both sides by y L = 140 / y New area : ( y - 2 ) ( L + 3 ) = 136 ( y - 2 ) ( 140 / y + 3 ) = 136 y * 140 / y - 2 * 140 / y + 3 * y - 3 * 2 = 136 140 - 280 / y + 3 y - 6 = 136 - ...
May 12, 2016

Algebra
( 1 / 2 ) ( k - 5 ) = 3 Multiply both sides by 2 k - 5 = 6 Add 5 to both sides k - 5 + 5 = 6 + 5 k = 11 Proof : ( 1 / 2 ) ( k - 5 ) = ( 1 / 2 ) ( 11 - 5 ) = 6 / 2 = 3
May 10, 2016

College Math
x = 3 -inch bolts y = 4 -inch bolts James bought 24 bolts. This mean x + y = 24 36 cents = \$ 0.36 42 cents = \$ 0.42 Total price = \$ 9 This mean : 0.36 x + 0.42 y = 9 Now you must solve system : x + y = 24 0.36 x + 0.42 y = 9 Try.
May 6, 2016

Math
17 85 : 51 = 17 * 5 : ( 17 * 3 ) = 5 : 3
May 5, 2016

Geometry (Help)
12 cm / 4 cm = 3 16 cm / 4 cm = 4 8 cm / 4 cm = 2 3 * 4 * 2 = 24 balls
May 4, 2016

Algebra 1
90 gallons of a 23% salt water = 90 * 23 / 100 = 2070 /100 = 20.7 gallons of salt. x = quantity of salt wather y = quantity of fresh wather Fresh wather have 0 % salt. This mean all salt come on 30 % salt wather. Quantity of salt in 30 % salt wather = 0.3 x 0.3 x = 20.7 Divide...
May 4, 2016

MATH HELP ASAP
In a Geometric Sequence each term is found by multiplying the previous term by a constant. In this case constant = 0.5 Geometric Sequence
May 4, 2016

MATH HELP ASAP
1.6 * 0.5 = 0.8 0.8 * 0.5 = 0.4 0.4 * 0.5 = 0.2 What do you think that is?
May 4, 2016

math
1 3/8 = 1 + 3 / 8 = 8 / 8 + 3 / 8 = 11 / 8 ( 1 3/8 ) / ( 5 / 8 ) = ( 11 / 8 ) / ( 5 / 8 ) = ( 8 * 11 ) / ( 8 * 5 ) = 11 / 5 = 10 / 5 + 1 / 5 = 2 + 1 / 5 = 2 1/5 = 2.2
May 4, 2016

MATH HELP ASAP
If you think on 4,8,12,16,... then : an = 4 n a20 = 4 *20 = 80
May 4, 2016

Post a New Question