Sunday
March 26, 2017

Post a New Question

Posted by on .

what is 1250* 2987??

  • Multiplication - ,

    www.wolframalpha.com

  • Multiplication - ,

    3733750

  • Multiplication - ,

    Let's try this without a calculator.

    1250*2987 =

    8*1250*2987/8 =

    10,000*2987/8 =

    10,000*(3000 - 13)/8 =

    10,000*(1500 - 6.5)/4 =

    10,000*(750 - 3.25)/2 =

    10,000*(375 - 1.625)=

    10,000*373.375 =

    3733750

  • Multiplication - ,

    "what is 1250* 2987"

    Let's do this mentally:
    1250*2987
    =29870000*0.125
    =29870000/8
    = 3733750

Answer This Question

First Name:
School Subject:
Answer:

Related Questions

More Related Questions

Post a New Question