Tuesday

September 23, 2014

September 23, 2014

Posted by **mark** on Wednesday, June 27, 2012 at 12:08pm.

379 x 24

379 x 450

Multiply by using the Russian Peasant Method

27 x 79

38 x 126

- math -
**Ms. Sue**, Wednesday, June 27, 2012 at 12:15pmThese sites will help you.

http://www.coolmath4kids.com/times-tables/times-tables-lesson-lattice-multiplication-1.html

http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=cijuPxHgZAA

http://www.basic-mathematics.com/russian-peasant-multiplication.html

http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=L6wYOpjgDZw

- math -
**Nicole**, Tuesday, October 2, 2012 at 6:44pm473 x16 in lattice

**Answer this Question**

**Related Questions**

math - Multiply. Use the lattice method. 277*32= I hope your teacher does not ...

math - can someone make a lattice table. i have to multiply 523*73 using lattice...

Math 110 - Write 278 as a product of prime numbers. Multiply 28x72 using lattice...

Math 110 UOP - Multiply 28x72 using lattice method. Find the Pythagorean triple ...

Algerbra 1 - 1 15-4.10-14 2 9x-18=54 x= 3 Multiply 8/9(b-72) 4 Solve using the ...

need guidance on an algebra problem - 20 x+3(y-1)=11 2(x-y)+8y = 28 multiply ...

math - How do I solve the equations using the elimination method: .3x-.2y=4 and...

math - Multiply using duplication and multiplication 8x363

algebra - Solve. x/9-1/7=26/63 STEP 1: The LCM is _________ To clear ...

math-5 - Which choice is the answer? Show me please. Tara spent 3 hours doing ...