Posted by Anonymous on Tuesday, November 15, 2011 at 8:19pm.
17*23 can be done in the head as 20²-3²=400-9=391.
For information on expanded algorithm for teachers, see:
math - arrays and an expanded algorithm 23*17
Math - How do you do arrays and an expanded algorithm. 23 X 17?
math homework - arrays and expanded algorithim 23.17
4th Grade Math - Arrays and an expanded algorithm: 23 x 17
arrays an expanded algorithm - I need an example to help my son like 23x17
multiplication and arrays - strategy practice explain hoe you can multiply 3x24 ...
AP Statistics - Of all U.S. fourth graders, 71% are assigned mathematics ...
math - Studies have shown a particular television commercial is understood by 25...
math - arrays and an expanded algorithm of 29x47=
math - explain how to do arrays and an expanded algorithm
For Further Reading